Accounts and annual returns SRI RAJARAJESHWARI AMMAN TEMPLE

Charity Number: 1191790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 30 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 26 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required