ENFIELD CHURCHES DEBT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Employment of a Debt Centre Manager who will work with referrals from the Christians Against Poverty helpline, or other recognised referral agency. We provide regular Money Courses through accredited trainers. We provide pastoral support for those in financial difficulty through a network of locally trained volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Michael Frederick Parnell | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Matthew Alexander Bell | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER DESMOND | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Chanda | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dufton | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Bleasdale-Barr | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Harding | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.59k | £33.28k | £26.89k | £18.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £20.72k | £29.00k | £20.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING AND PROMOTING THE PROVISIONS OF ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR PERSONAL FINANCES IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AND ELSEWHERE AND THROUGH CARE, COMPASSION AND THE RELEVANT PRACTICAL AND SPIRITUAL HELP AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
145 Ladysmith Road
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN1 3AH
- Phone:
- 02083665009
- Email:
- office.ecdc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window