ONE WOMAN A YEAR INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are working on providing free basic English and math tutorial lessons that are easily accessible by women and girls. We communicate with beneficiaries virtually, thus there is no specification location where we operate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- United States
Governance
- 09 March 2021: CIO registration
- OWAY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kim Motley | Trustee | 25 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Lam | Trustee | 20 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matt Dawe | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 11 May 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 11 May 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR WOMEN FROM DEVELOPING COUNTRIES, BY PROVIDING RESOURCES FOR WOMEN TO PURSUE HIGHER EDUCATION IN DEVELOPED COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 BOSCOMBE AVENUE
HORNCHURCH
Essex
RM11 1JG
- Phone:
- 02081331611
- Email:
- info.onewomanayear@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window