The Choral Evensong Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to locate and promote choral evensong via an easily accessible web-based platform. The ChoralEvensong.org website enables users to search for nearby evensong (and vespers) services listed by date and location (currently 750 choirs are enrolled). Raising awareness amongst the wider public of the high quality choral music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 July 2020: CIO registration
- CHORALEVENSONG.ORG (Working name)
- THE CHORALEVENSONG.ORG TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RALPH ALLWOOD MBE, DMus | Chair | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Canon Sir Jonathan Guy Jones KCB KC hon | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Guy Daniel Hayward | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alfred Rupert Sheldrake | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.78k | £2.91k | £2.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.90k | £3.17k | £3.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 211 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jul 2020 as amended on 23 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF CHORAL SERVICES AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WILLOW ROAD
LONDON
NW3 1TJ
- Phone:
- 07841518110
- Email:
- info@choralevensong.org
- Website:
-
choralevensong.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window