LOVE LEEDS PARKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Love Leeds Parks supports community-led enhancements to public parks and green spaces in Leeds. We raise awareness about the wide ranging benefits of parks, promote community engagement in urban green spaces and generate donations for park improvement projects. The projects we fund are community focused and add value to public green spaces, as well as prioritising parks in deprived areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,759 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 22 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Casey Pae Morrison | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Campbell | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Barker PhD | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dean Ellison | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin Dominic Scully | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Preston | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lynda Kitching | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £8.89k | £137.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.56k | £96.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE GREEN SPACE (PARKS, GARDENS, LANDSCAPED AREAS, WOODLAND, RECREATIONAL SPACES, NATURE RESERVES AND CEMETERIES) FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEEDS FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Love Leeds Parks
Farnley Hall
Farnley Hall Park
Hall Lane
Leeds
LS12 5HA
- Phone:
- 01133788191
- Email:
- info@loveleedsparks.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window