CANTUS FIRMUS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cantus Firmus Trust provides support and training in the use of creative arts (music, dance, drama) for use in Christian worship and ministry, and presents themed events containing some or all of these elements. The expanding Cantus Firmus choir supports events and activities in North Essex and Suffolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Freestone | Chair | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PHILIP CHARLES DAVIES | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Deborah Ruth Cook | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Gosden | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey John Weaver | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David John Gunton | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|||||
HOWARD ROY GARDNER | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr OWEN ANTHONY THURTLE | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £5.93k | £9.97k | £9.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.64k | £5.33k | £12.53k | £9.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE DEVELOPMENT OF UNDERSTANDING, WORSHIP AND MISSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF INDIVIDUAL CHRISTIANS, GROUPS OF CHRISTIANS, PRACTITIONERS, ENQUIRERS AND LEARNERS BY MEANS OF THE CREATIVE ARTS - INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, DEMONSTRATIONS OF AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN HIGH QUALITY MUSIC, DANCE AND DRAMA - TOGETHER WITH THE ASSOCIATED EDUCATION AND TRAINING, AND TO SUPPORT SUCH EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY THE PROVISION OF MATERIALS AND THE MAKING OF GRANTS IN LOCATIONS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM,BUT PRINCIPALLY IN THE COUNTIES OF ESSEX AND SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Marlborough Road
IPSWICH
IP4 5AX
- Phone:
- 01473 719297
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window