Trustees THE BETHLEM ART AND HISTORY COLLECTIONS TRUST
Charity number: 1190303

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Martin Curran | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert John Howard | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin Donald Campbell | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Oyedeji Ayonrinde | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Leah Hudson | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Robertson | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Guinness | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Munn OBE | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Bateman | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joni Smart | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr NICHOLAS HERVEY | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.