BELPER BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist Denomination. It does this through Sunday worship and activities for children and young people Mid-week gatherings take place for prayer, bible study, craft ,fellowship, and children's activities. The church hosts a food bank and community hub run by Hope for Belper.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 10 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROBERT FOSTER | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rowena Ralphs | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adriaan Jacobus Van Wyk | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Bolger | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Sleeman White | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Lambourne | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Lesley | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.54k | £48.24k | £60.74k | £118.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.29k | £24.13k | £58.36k | £66.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELPER BAPTIST CHURCH
BRIDGE STREET
BELPER
DE56 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01629823440
- Email:
- questions@belperbaptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window