DEVON BUSINESS & EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the relief of unemployment To promote the education of people and the preservation of mental health To provide assistance to families in need To promote social inclusion To advance such other charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the charity trustees see fit from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 28 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Dominic Lorimer | Chair | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Law | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Sue Shelbourne | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Margaret Lorimer | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Iles | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Cristina De Aguiar Fazendeiro Wright | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.28k | £19.70k | £7.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.48k | £12.76k | £10.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. (B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (I) FACILITATING WORKSHOPS, TUTORING, MENTORING AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO THOSE WITH ADDITIONAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS WHICH THEY ARE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO ACCESS THROUGH THE MAINSTREAM EDUCATION SYSTEM, SO THAT THEY MAY GAIN THE SKILLS AND QUALIFICATIONS THEY NEED, WHERE THEIR EDUCATIONAL PROGRESS HAS BEEN ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY THE IMPACT OF THE COVID-19 PANDEMIC, RELATIONSHIP BREAKDOWN, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, BEREAVEMENT, OR WHERE THE PERSON HAS SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS; (II) FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF BUSINESS SKILLS TRAINING, COACHING, MENTORING AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP WHO WISH TO BECOME SELF-EMPLOYED AND/OR START A NEW BUSINESS, CO-OPERATIVE OR SOCIAL ENTERPRISE AS A MEANS OF RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS; (III) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY. (C) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY FACILITATING EDUCATION, SKILLS TRAINING, PRACTICAL ADVICE, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO ACCESS OPPORTUNITIES AND ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO HELP IMPROVE THEIR MENTAL HEALTH. (D) TO RELIEVE FAMILIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF RELATIONSHIP GUIDANCE, COACHING OR MENTORING TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY RELATIONSHIP. (E) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ÆSOCIALLY EXCLUDEDÆ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY AND/OR AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). (F) TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEVON BUSINESS & EDUCATION CENTRE
LOWER TALE
PAYHEMBURY
HONITON
EX14 3HL
- Phone:
- 01884220150
- Email:
- info@dbec.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window