UNITED KINGDOM & IRELAND SOCIETY OF CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE SURGEONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKISCRS promote education & research in the field of cataract & refractive surgery. We advance & promote the practice of ophthalmology and research. We promote experimental work & training in the field of cataract surgery, lens implantation, refractive surgery and the dissemination of results thereof. We communicate with its' members and wider ophthalmic community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor PHILIP Anthony BLOOM | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Milind Pande | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Henry Rosen | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £296.11k | £180.09k | £236.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.31k | £155.93k | £219.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROMOTING HIGH QUALITY CARE OF PATIENTS UNDERGOING CATARACT SURGERY AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY THROUGH PROMOTING BEST PRACTICE; B) PROMOTING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH RELATING TO CATARACT SURGERY AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY AND ALLIED FIELDS BY PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR PRESENTATION AND DISSEMINATION OF SUCH RESEARCH AND BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR SUCH RESEARCH; C) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE FIELD OF CATARACT SURGERY AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY AND ALLIED FIELDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 VILLAGE PLACE
LEIGH
WN7 2AB
- Phone:
- 07789950412
- Email:
- gillwood@ukiscrs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window