Trustees SHIFT ORGANISATION LTD
Charity number: 1191125

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Martin Griffiths | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keir Monteith KC | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hazzledine | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Luke Roberts | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Cramer | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rasheed Pendry | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Parkes | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Benjamin Clark | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.