NURSE LIFELINE


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 04 March 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the mental and emotional health and wellbeing of nurses, midwives, student nurses and midwives, healthcare support workers and friends and family of such staff groups within the UK through (including, but not limited to) a free, peer-led support phone service and website offering resources and education related to mental and emotional health support tools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Anne Griffiths - Group Captain Retired- | Chair | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Pons Laplana | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Robinson | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Ralph Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lara Jane Jukes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Joanna Coleman | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Elizabeth Lister | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.62k | £33.98k | £77.95k | £39.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.45k | £45.53k | £67.51k | £61.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO NURSES, MIDWIVES, STUDENT NURSES AND MIDWIVES, HEALTHCARE SUPPORT WORKERS AND FRIENDS AND FAMILY OF SUCH STAFF GROUPS WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO) A FREE, PEER-LED SUPPORT PHONE SERVICE AND WEBSITE OFFERING RESOURCES AND EDUCATION FOR MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH TO THOSE IN NEED THROUGH CONFIDENTIAL EMOTIONAL SUPPORT FOR AT RISK STAFF AND REDUCING THE RISK OF SUICIDE BY SIGNPOSTING TO APPROPRIATE SERVICES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM REGARDING MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH, WITH A FOCUS UPON NURSES, MIDWIVES, STUDENT NURSES AND MIDWIVES AND HEALTHCARE SUPPORT WORKERS, THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS AT EVENTS AND VIA ONLINE MEDIA. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND)2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nurse Lifeline
85 Great Portland Street
London
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 07754127843
- Email:
- ops@nurselifeline.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window