THE HIGHGATE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Highgate Choral Society are the advancement of the art and culture of music by the presentation of concerts and other ancillary activities. We generally give 4 classical choral concerts each year in November, March and July at All Hallow's Church, NW3, and one in March and a Family Carol Concert at St Michael's Church, Highgate in December.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Brent
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 11 September 2020: CIO registration
- 08 April 2022: Funds received from 265651 THE HIGHGATE CHORAL SOCIETY
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ali Brodie | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Felicity Dirmeik | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Janet Melinda Floyd | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Peter King | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashitey Kwame Nii-Amaa Ollennu | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr EMILY JANE LUCY FINCH | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Ursula Susan Taylor | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bronwen Burman | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD IAN GOURLAY | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luke Eyre Randolph | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.58k | £103.16k | £141.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.15k | £109.27k | £137.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS AND CULTURE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND CULTURE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ANCILLARY ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 St. Georges Avenue
LONDON
N7 0AJ
- Phone:
- 07768761242
- Email:
- treasurer@hcschoir.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window