CYLCH MEITHRIN RHOSNEIGR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare provision for 2- 4 year olds at the Caban on Ysgol Rhosneigr's site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,797 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 23 June 2020: CIO registration
- 17 July 2023: Funds received from 1035695 RHOSNEIGR PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Goddard | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sulwen Hughes | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luan Jones | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.20k | £31.09k | £34.06k | £30.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.76k | £31.03k | £34.68k | £31.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.30k | £24.00k | £28.57k | £26.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 April 2025 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 368 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2024 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 April 2025 | 794 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
AMCAN[ION] Y SCE YW: HYRWYDDO ADDYSG GYFRWNG CYMRAEG I BLANT OED CYN YSGOL YN RHOSNEIGR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN RHOSNEIGR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Y CABAN
Ysgol Gynradd Rhosneigr
RHOSNEIGR
LL64 5XA
- Phone:
- 07748715564
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window