CLEVELAND AND TEESSIDE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society, which was formed in 1968, takes an active part in preserving our heritage. We promote various projects in local history and offer advice. We maintain links with local archives, libraries, museums and groups connected with archaeology, family history and industrial archaeology. Lectures and guided walks are held throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Darlington
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 22 April 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Stuart BRADDY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Kenneth Little | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Larry Bruce | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Tweedy | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Sam Gibson Falcus | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON BROWN | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA POLLEY | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Francis Peagam | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|||||
IAN STUBBS Treasurer | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|||||
VAL HARRISON | Trustee | 22 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS JENNY BRADDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEWART RAMSDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL BRENDA COOK | Trustee |
|
||||||
LEE FIRTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.74k | £1.57k | £5.20k | £3.28k | £3.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.97k | £957 | £2.68k | £3.74k | £2.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 1968 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 1969, 23 MARCH 1973, 21 MARCH 1980, 25 MARCH 1983,15 MARCH 1985 AND 14 MARCH 2001 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 14 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY DEVELOPING PUBLIC INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF LOCAL HISTORY CONCERNING CLEVELAND AND TEESSIDE.
Area of benefit
REDCAR AND CLEVELAND, HARTLEPOOL,MIDDLESBROUGH, STOCKTON-ON-TEES AND TEESSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Tasman Drive
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS18 5LA
- Phone:
- 07752548571
- Email:
- MARTIN@PEAGAM.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window