THE FALCONRY CENTRE, HAGLEY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Falconry Centre is a licensed zoo open to the public displaying birds of prey from around the world. We offer educational talks and displays, bird encounters, and support conservation work through fundraising and breeding birds of prey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James Plant BSc. | Chair | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Atherton LLB | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER JENNIFER BRYNMORE-JONES | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JUSTINA MARIA GIBBS BSC. | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARIE LOUISE KUBIAK KUBIAK BVSC MRCVS | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Garvey BSc. | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Ashfield RVN VNES | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/06/2021 | 18/06/2022 | 18/06/2023 | 18/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.99k | £156.37k | £171.05k | £184.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.09k | £152.54k | £154.06k | £159.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 June 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 June 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 June 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 June 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 June 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 June 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
4.1. TO PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF ALL SPECIES OF RAPTORS (BIRDS OF PREY) TOGETHER WITH THEIR VARYING HABITATS WORLDWIDE, THROUGH BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY CAPTIVE BREEDING PROGRAMMES, THE TREATMENT AND REHABILITATION OF WILD INJURED RAPTORS AND CONTRIBUTING TO RESEARCH INTO THE BREEDING, HABITAT AND HEALTH OF ALL BIRDS OF PREY. 4.2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND WELFARE OF RAPTORS TOGETHER WITH THE HERITAGE AND HISTORY OF FALCONRY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE, THROUGH BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY CONDUCTING EXHIBITIONS, FLYING DISPLAYS AND DEMONSTRATIONS TOGETHER WITH THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL LITERATURE AND MATERIALS TO INSTIL AMONGST OTHER THINGS THE IMPORTANCE OF SPECIES OF RAPTORS AND THEIR DIVERSE HABITAT IN THE WILD. 4.3. TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF RAPTORS AS THE DIRECTORS MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FALCONRY CENTRE
HAGLEY LTD
KIDDERMINSTER ROAD SOUTH
HAGLEY
WEST MIDLANDS
- Phone:
- 01562700014
- Email:
- info@thefalconrycentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window