THE LONELINESS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting people at risk of loneliness and isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Catherine Young | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Kathryn Danaher | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Margaret Danaher | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 April 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE EXPERIENCING LONELINESS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN THE UK, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO THOSE EXPERIENCING LONELINESS, AND CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS, WORKING TO TACKLE THE ISSUE OF LONELINESS OR RAISE AWARENESS OF THE ISSUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SYCAMORES
COOPERS CORNER
IDE HILL
SEVENOAKS
TN14 6LB
- Phone:
- 02086504972
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window