VETERANS COMMUNITY NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Veterans Community Network provides a professional veteran peer mentor service to Veterans, Reservists and Family Members living in Buckinghamshire, Bedfordshire and Northamptonshire. Peer mentors offer intensive help getting our service users to engage and remain in treatment and support services. We help motivate our service users to recognise and accept that they may need specialist help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £88,944 from 9 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 23 October 2020: CIO registration
- VCN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pat Mary Haslam | Chair | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David John Hearn | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gary Edwin Middleton | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Clark | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ian Dunkley | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah CRUICKSHANK | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.34k | £101.80k | £105.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.77k | £109.93k | £111.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £88.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.42k | £91.89k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND TO PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF EX-SERVICE PERSONNEL (HM ARMED FORCES) AND RESERVISTS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE, AND BEDFORDSHIRE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING THEM WITH COMRADESHIP, HELP AND ASSISTANCE AND BY OFFERING THEM A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE TO EXPERT SUPPORT PROVIDERS FOR THEIR BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Union House
111 New Union Street
Coventry
CV1 2NT
- Phone:
- +447902632949
- Email:
- admin@vcn.org.uk
- Website:
-
vcn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window