3RD EASTWOOD (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
3rd Eastwood (St Mary's) Scout Group provides activities for boys and girls in the Beavers (6 yrs - 8 yrs), cubs (8 yrs - 10 1/2 yrs) and scouts (10 1/2 yrs - 14 yrs). These activities are aimed at encouraging social and life skills: independence, initiative, leadership and survival. They attend camps (e.g. canoeing) where they utilise these skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 17 April 1985: Standard registration
- 3RD EASTWOOD SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Brookes | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL WILMOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.26k | £3.03k | £2.62k | £10.30k | £5.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82k | £1.35k | £3.72k | £6.15k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.05k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER - 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
175 South Street
Eastwood
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 3PG
- Phone:
- 07714105156
- Email:
- scouting@garybrookes.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window