POETRY IN INSTITUTIONS, EDUCATION AND SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 2020: CIO registration
- PIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baraka Malik Meena | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hellen Lawuo-Meena | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Felicity Poole | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Albert Eliawony Meena | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 397 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 397 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 763 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 763 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1128 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1128 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION OF MENTAL OR MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN INSTITUTIONS SUCH AS, BUT NOT LIMITED TO; SCHOOLS, YOUTH CENTRES, PRISONS AND WORKPLACES WHO STRUGGLE WITH COPING WITHIN THEIR SETTING, SUCH AS STUDENTS WHO ARE ON REPORT OR REGULARLY IN DETENTION, UNSETTLED AND VOLATILE PRISONERS AND WORK TEAMS WHO WOULD BENEFIT FROM TEAM-BUILDING EXERCISES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF POETRY-BASED WORKSHOPS AND SEMINARS WHICH WILL ENCOURAGE PARTICIPANTS TO ENGAGE IN HEALTHY CONVERSATION ABOUT SELF-EXPRESSION, COMING TO TERMS WITH THEIR RESPONSIBILITIES AND ROLES WITHIN SOCIETY, AS WELL AS HOW THEY CAN ACHIEVE POSITIVE MENTAL AND MORAL GROWTH THROUGH WRITING, READING AND ANALYSING POETRY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WESTLANDS CLOSE
SLOUGH
SL1 6AW
- Phone:
- 07738434271
- Email:
- barakameena@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window