THE BREWERS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the Foundation is the giving of grants and donations to selected charities and good causes based in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neal Brewer | Chair | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Shoesmith | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Thomson | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BREWER | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400.00k | £425.04k | £217.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £75.07k | £145.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BREWERS FOUNDATION ARE: (A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH VIA MEDICAL TREATMENT AND RESEARCH; AND (D) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS MAY BE WHOLLY AND EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW RELATING TO CHARITIES IN ENGLAND AND WALES. BY MAKING GRANTS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL PROMOTE THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALBANY HOUSE
ASHFORD ROAD
EASTBOURNE
EAST SUSSEX
BN21 3TR
- Phone:
- 01603762103
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window