FRINTON FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Frinton Free Church provides public benefit to the local community & surrounding areas - opportunities for spiritual, physical, intellectual, social and cultural development with mid week activities in which the local community both participates and benefits
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 09 February 2021: CIO registration
- 04 April 2024: Funds received from 1131856 FRINTON FREE CHURCH
- THE FREE (Working name)
- THE FREE FRINTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARK MASSEY | Chair | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Natalie Harris | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simbarashe Bob Chandiwana | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nigel Watkins | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Hamer | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Keeys | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bell | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Bates | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £407.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £443.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRINTON FREE CHURCH
2-4 CONNAUGHT AVENUE
FRINTON-ON-SEA
CO13 9PW
- Phone:
- 01255679585
- Email:
- office@frintonfree.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window