BARKING COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity Number: 1191779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the religion of Islam for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures, community outreach work, religious education, and public celebration of religious festivals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £162,093
Total expenditure: £48,461

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Barking And Dagenham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YOUSUF HUSSAIN KHAN Chair 26 April 2023
HEDGECOCK COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
Syed Ahbab Hussain Trustee 14 March 2023
None on record
Aros Ali Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
Anwar Miah Trustee 09 February 2021
None on record
SURUK AHMED Trustee 13 October 2020
HOPE FOUNDATION TRUST
Received: On time
HEDGECOCK COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
HARUN MIAH Trustee 13 October 2020
HEDGECOCK COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
Nazrul Islam Khan Trustee 13 October 2020
None on record
MD Shahanur Rahman Trustee 13 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 30/04/2024
Total gross income £190.36k £132.71k £162.09k
Total expenditure £18.12k £25.20k £48.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 22 April 2024 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 22 April 2024 235 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 20 January 2023 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 20 January 2023 142 days late
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
190 SALISBURY AVENUE
BARKING
IG11 9XX
Phone:
07985129466
Website:

No information available