JAI HANUMAN TEMPLE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NARANDAS KANJI ADATIA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
HITESH PUJARA | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RAJANIKANT PURSHOTTAM DAWADA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND WORSHIP, THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF HINDU FESTIVALS; (2) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; (3) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, AND COSTS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (4) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 WINDSOR AVENUE
LEICESTER
LE4 5DT
- Phone:
- 01162663820
- Email:
- ANITA_ADATIA@YAHOO.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window