PENDEEN PILOT GIG CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an inclusive, amateur, Cornish Pilot Gig Rowing Club. We row on the open sea in 32ft gig boats, out of Newlyn harbour. Our age range is 9-82, in all genders, we promote physical and mental health well being, by offering training, team-work & social rowing. Social events are very important to us. "Silent Mountain" is our community boat, open to all other clubs and organisations to hire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £3,120 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 July 2022: CIO registration
- PENDEEN GIG CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN TRACEY NANKERVIS Delve | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edward Saunders | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Lane | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Russell John Mugglestone | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Helen Spicer | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Jane Mulholland | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Maria Murphy | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.37k | £12.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.77k | £8.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 12 December 2024 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 12 December 2024 | 315 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CORNWALL BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR GIG ROWING AND ASSOCIATED SPORTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Trenwith Lane
ST. IVES
Cornwall
TR26 1DD
- Phone:
- 07922448956
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window