WESTVIEW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has a small community centre wit free wifi access, supports children's and young people's activities, manages allotments, a park and community/social prescribing gardens. WCA is an active partner with the NHS, Council and other organisations. During the covid crisis WCA has led a whole town project to provide weekly food to over 1000 people in Fleetwood and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £14,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 21 September 2020: CIO registration
- 01 November 2021: Funds received from 1081016 WESTVIEW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Clarke | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Buswell | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Fiona Macneill | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Shaun MacNeill | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hickey | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eamon Timothy | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.14k | £98.43k | £60.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.04k | £92.40k | £51.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £38.28k | £33.94k | £14.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(A)THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO BENEFIT FLEETWOOD WITH A FOCUS ON THE WESTVIEW NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE BOTH FORMAL AND INFORMAL EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 EDEN AVENUE
FLEETWOOD
FY7 8DH
- Phone:
- 01253870133
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window