THE JUNCTION ELITE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work primarily within the London boroughs of Lambeth and Wandsworth, but are looking to expand when we're able to. We look to help children and youths from disadvantaged backgrounds enjoy sport and experience the benefits associated with participation. As well as this we are open to other areas and activities that can provide similar benefits
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 02 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Phillips | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Claire Blake | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Billy Oram | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Stocker | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.16k | £2.04k | £21.46k | £61.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.12k | £2.03k | £21.46k | £61.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 March 2025 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 March 2025 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 March 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 282 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 GREGORY CRESCENT
LONDON
SE9 5RY
- Phone:
- 07557043338
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window