GREEK SCHOOL OF MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities undertaken by the Greek School of Manchester aim to advance the Greek language and culture and to enhance the educational experiences of children young people and adults living in Manchester providing for instruction and the opportunity to converse in the Greek language via variety of activities, educational, material, projects, contests and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Salford City
Governance
- 21 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chrysa Walker | Chair | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anastastia Bacharidou | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Lagoutsiou | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Panagiotis Thliveros | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Evrikleia Koutidou M.A. | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/06/2021 | 30/07/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.04k | £17.00k | £27.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.96k | £16.14k | £25.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 June 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 June 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GREEK SCHOOL OF MANCHESTER ARE: - TO ADVANCE THE GREEK LANGUAGE AND CULTURE AND TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATIONAL EXPERIENCES OF CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS LIVING IN MANCHESTER WHO ATTEND IT IN PARTICULAR BUT NO EXCLUSIVE BY: (A) PROVIDING FOR INSTRUCTION AND THE OPPORTUNITY TO CONVERSE IN THE GREEK LANGUAGE VIA VARIETY OF ACTIVITIES, EDUCATIONAL, MATERIAL, PROJECTS, CONTESTS AND EVENTS; (B) PROVIDING OF THE OBSERVANCE OF GREEK CUSTOMS, FESTIVALS AND CEREMONIES, PROMOTING AN INTERCULTURAL DIALOGUE THAT HIGHLIGHTS THE IMPORTANCE OF RESPECTING OTHERS; (C) OFFERING THE OPPORTUNITY TO STUDENTS OF ALL AGES TO OBTAIN OFFICIAL QUALIFICATIONS/CERTIFICATES OF ATTAINMENT IN MODERN GREEK LANGUAGE AS A FOREIGN /SECOND LANGUAGE ORGANIZED BY VARIOUS PROVIDERS, INCLUDING BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO PEARSON EDEXCEL (UK) AND THE HELLENIC CULTURE CENTER (GREECE); (D) UNDERTAKING OTHER ACTIVITIES TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL OUTCOMES OF ITS STUDENTS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Bailey Street
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 1HQ
- Phone:
- 07906223324
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window