SOCIETY FOR THE HISTORY OF ALCHEMY AND CHEMISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE SOCIETY PROMOTES THE SCHOLARLY STUDY OF ALL ASPECTS OF THE HISTORY OF THE CHEMICAL SCIENCES (INCLUDING ALCHEMY). IT HOLDS MEETINGS FOR THE READING AND DISCUSSION OF SCHOLARLY PAPERS, PROVIDES SMALL RESEARCH GRANTS, IN PARTICULAR TO POSTGRADUATE STUDENTS AND POST-DOCTORAL RESEARCHERS, AND PUBLISHES ARTICLES AND ESSAYS, ESPECIALLY IN AMBIX, THE JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- China
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Estonia
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Mexico
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 08 July 2020: CIO registration
- SHAC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor FRANK ARTHUR JOHN LORD JAMES | Chair | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Wilson | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Ramberg | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tara Nummedal | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Annette Lykknes | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr TILLMANN TAAPE | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNA ELIZABETH WOODMAN | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr VIVIANE MARGUERITE QUIRKE | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr JENNIFER MARGARET RAMPLING | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ALEXANDER JOHNSTONE | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR HASOK CHANG | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr DELIA GEORGIANA HEDESAN | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER JONATHAN FORSHAW | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher John Campbell | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bruce Thomas Moran | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR LAWRENCE MICHAEL PRINCIPE | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr CAROLYN ANN COBBOLD | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.22k | £26.93k | £27.02k | £32.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.38k | £13.74k | £18.71k | £16.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AS A LEARNED SOCIETY, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE, AND SCIENCE THROUGH SCHOLARLY AND/OR CURATORIAL ACTIVITY RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF ALCHEMICAL AND CHEMICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AND OF OTHER SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED BY: (1) PUBLISHING A SCHOLARLY JOURNAL AND BY MAINTAINING MEMBERSHIP (2) PUBLISHING OCCASIONAL SCHOLARLY WORKS; (3) PROVIDING STUDY GRANTS TO STUDENTS AND EARLY CAREER RESEARCHERS; (4) FUNDING AND / OR ORGANISING SCHOLARLY MEETINGS, WORKSHOPS AND SEMINARS. (5) DISSEMINATING INFORMATION NOT ONLY ON THE SOCIETY’S EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES BUT THOSE OF OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE SAME AND RELATED FIELDS; (6) AWARDING PRIZES FOR ACHIEVEMENT IN SCHOLARSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 THE DRIVE
ISLEWORTH
TW7 4AA
- Phone:
- 07394070924
- Email:
- treasurer@ambix.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window