BIRMINGHAM TREE PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Birmingham Tree People aims to plant, promote and protect trees in Birmingham. We provide free monthly training and organise activities. We are also a registered training centre for the Skills Education Group Level 2 in Arboriculture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,535 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 23 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tonia Jane Margaret Clark | Chair | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Dobbie | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julianne Mary Statham | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Weston | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Tucker | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deanne Brettle | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nina Griffiths | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.56k | £28.90k | £39.79k | £87.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.74k | £36.42k | £25.30k | £86.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.00k | N/A | £10.80k | £20.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL IMPROVEMENT IN BIRMINGHAM BY PLANTING, MAINTAINING, PRESERVING AND PROMOTING TREES TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF TREES AND TREE CARE AND TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO FULFIL THE ROLE OF VOLUNTEER TREE WARDENS.
Area of benefit
IN BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 SOMERSET ROAD
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2JD
- Phone:
- 01212411539
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window