AOIFE'S BUBBLES CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UKs only childhood cancer charity dedicated to raising awareness of germ cell cancer in children alongside providing mental health and emotional support to families affected by childhood cancer, childhood cancer awareness campaigns, changing diagnosis times, supporting further treatment options and providing acts of joy and respite to children and their families affected by childhood cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Eleanor Payne | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Kelly Merritt | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Flanagan | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Payne | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
EILISH ANNE PATRICIA FLANAGAN | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.49k | £55.33k | £55.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.14k | £64.38k | £57.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 NOV 2019 DATED 21 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AGED 0-17 WHO HAVE GERM CELL CANCER AND OTHER FORMS OF CANCER BY: • SUPPLYING GIFTS AND ITEMS TO THOSE CHILDREN AND WHERE APPROPRIATE THEIR SIBLINGS; • RAISING AWARENESS OF CHILDHOOD CANCER AND WORKING WITH OTHER REGISTERED CHILDREN'S CHARITIES TO DO THE SAME. • PROVIDING GRANTS TO PAY OR CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS A HOLIDAY FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN WHO HAVE GERM CELL CANCER AND OTHER FORMS OF CANCER BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR RESEARCH INTO CHILDHOOD CANCER AND IN PARTICULAR, GERM CELL CANCER
Contact information
- Address:
-
MCCALMONT MANOR
MCCALMONT DRIVE
RAYLEIGH
SS6 9TZ
- Phone:
- 07760880568
- Email:
- info@aoifesbubbles.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window