EVELYN PARENTS FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evelyn Parents Forum exists to give families safe, welcoming play opportunities, for friendship and parenting support. We are based at "Moira's Place" a wonderful stay-and-play space by the playground in Deptford Park, SE8. We are open to pre-schoolers and babies during term, and run holiday play schemes to include primary-aged siblings. Search "Evelyn Parents Forum" on Facebook for more info!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 27 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Kelly-Skinner | Chair | 16 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Arezu Isats | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurentina Risch | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA LEIGH HIBBS MA | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.56k | £24.84k | £14.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.69k | £3.72k | £13.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.80k | £20.63k | £13.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 April 2025 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 April 2025 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 211 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 484 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 484 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BELOW STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND PROVIDE LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR FAMILIES IN GREENWICH LAMBETH, LEWISHAM AND SOUTHWARK.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moira's Place - the Play Club
Deptford Park Pavilion
DEPTFORD PARK
SCAWEN ROAD
LONDON
SE8 5AG
- Phone:
- 07966025124
- Email:
- eveynparents@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window