Accounts and annual returns PILLAR COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1190413
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 16 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 16 February 2025 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2023 06 March 2024 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 06 March 2024 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2022 04 April 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 04 April 2023 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 09 January 2023 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 09 January 2023 339 days late Download Open in new window