THE CHERYL KING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cheryl King Trust promotes and advances the musical education of children and young people in particular, but not exclusively, by the provision of grants and funding to enable the beneficiaries to start or continue with individual or group musical instrument lessons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marianne Emmy Windham | Chair | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tristan O'Dwyer Mr | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Jack Hennessey-Brown | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive William Grant | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.62k | £8.97k | £23.49k | £27.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.61k | £7.42k | £11.42k | £14.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (THE ‘BENEFICIARIES’) IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FUNDING TO ENABLE THE BENEFICIARIES TO START OR CONTINUE WITH INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP MUSICAL INSTRUMENT LESSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Litchfield Way
Guildford
GU2 7QH
- Phone:
- 01483825247
- Email:
- info@cherylkingtrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window