100TH BOMB GROUP MEMORIAL MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
o advance the education of the public by the operation of a museum for the exhibition and preservation of aircraft and aeronautical equipment of historical and technical interest particularly from the second world war. The museum is on the wartime airfield of Thorpe Abbotts and commemorates the 100th bomb group of the U.S.A.A.F that flew from there.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
Governance
- 29 July 2020: CIO registration
- 26 August 2022: Funds received from 285169 THE 100TH BOMB GROUP MEMORIAL MUSEUM
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debra Elizabeth Hubbard | Chair | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Reginald Herbert Wilson | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Christopher Poole | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Holland | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Henry Gibson | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Charles Batley | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £450.01k | £82.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £70.40k | £90.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF A MUSEUM AND MEMORIAL FOR THE EXHIBITION AND PRESERVATION OF AIRCRAFT AND AERONAUTICAL OBJECTS AND INFORMATION RELATED TO THOSE ASSOCIATED WITH THE 100TH BOMB GROUP AT THORPE ABBOTTS NORFOLK CIRCA 1943 – 1945.
Contact information
- Address:
-
100th Bomb Group Memorial Museum
Common Road
Dickleburgh
DISS
IP21 4PH
- Phone:
- 01379740708
- Email:
- info@100bgmus.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window