THE FERNS PRIMARY ACADEMY PTFA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to provide additional resources for associated primary school. Organises social events for local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 May 1985: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FRIENDS OF PLODDER LANE SCHOOL (Working name)
- PLODDER LANE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE FERNS PRIMARY ACADEMY PTA (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.27k | £4.32k | £4.10k | £4.38k | £3.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.73k | £4.46k | £3.32k | £3.87k | £3.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 30 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 27 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/05/1983 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY:- (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHER ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window