Friends of Kididima

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Stone Outward Mombasa Project (Friends of Kididima) is to support a school in Mtwapa, Mombasa, Kenya. The aim of the Friends of Kididima is to facilitate the education and care for 150 - 200 very poor and needy children from the age of three years. Many of the children are from destitute families and some are orphaned.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kenya
Governance
- 13 August 2020: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF KIDIDIMA (Working name)
- STONE OUTWARD MOMBASA PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN ELIZABETH RECINE | Chair | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Hannah Ainsworth | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Veronica Gurman | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Judith Woods | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Moira Ann Cullen | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIE KAREN TANNER | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.22k | £19.28k | £20.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.63k | £18.55k | £21.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Aug 2020 as amended on 16 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT KIDIDIMA PRIMARY SCHOOL, MTWAPA, KENYA, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PEOPLE LIVING IN KIDIDIMA, MTWAPA KENYA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: OFFERING EDUCATION AND ACCESS TO PREVENTATIVE HEALTH INITIATIVES ENABLING THE SCHOOL, PARENTS, CHILDREN AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TO ACCESS RESOURCES AT THE HEALTH FACILITY, THIS IN TURN WILL HELP TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 VICTORIA STREET
STONE
ST15 8HP
- Phone:
- 01785607647
- Email:
- moira.cullen@mail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window