Accounts and annual returns MPILO GOOD LIFE FOUNDATIONS

Charity number: 1192230
Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window