MARKAZ IBRAHEEM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and providing service to the youth and elderly of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Somalia
- Uganda
Governance
- 07 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hamza Mohamed Nur Muhidin | Chair | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hussein munye Noor | Trustee | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohamad Hamza | Trustee | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abdulrahman Hamza | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.41k | £36.53k | £50.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.10k | £34.62k | £41.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 June 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 June 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP AND INSTRUCTION IN BASIC TENETS AND RITUALS OF THE FAITH. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH TEACHING AND PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL COURSES AND TRAINING. C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY PROVIDING PERSONS WITH GRANTS, GOODS , AND OTHER SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEIR BASIC NEEDS OF EDUCATION, FOOD, CLOTHING, SHELTER, HEALTHCARE OR MEDICAL AID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37-39
UPPER LLOYD STREET
MANCHESTER
M14 4HY
- Phone:
- 07842515485
- Email:
- 786mrkz@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window