CORRAN DEAN LIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide leisure and occupational therapy care through interactive opportunities caring and feeding animals on the farm. Interaction with the land, plants, nature. We provide meaningful activities and equipment for the services based at Smokey Farm, including: Summer BBQ's, trips out to local attractions and events. Equipment for developing independent skills and self-help for fullfilling lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Brockie | Chair | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT NICHOLS | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ashwin | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216 | £6.57k | £6.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33 | £3.17k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 412 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 March 2025 | 777 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE; TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE LEARNING AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND/OR ADDITIONAL NEEDS, AND THEIR CARERS BY PROVISION OF LEISURE AND OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY AND CARE, TOWARDS A FULFILLING LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meadow View
Smokey Lane
Cropthorne
WR10 3NF
- Phone:
- 07593011406
- Email:
- corranshelley@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window