Trustees H A TAYLOR FUND

Charity number: 516428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Ann Harrison Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Michael Francis McLoughlin Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Linda Parish Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Ann Veronica Barkley Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Peter Black Trustee 02 December 2020
None on record
Clive Stephen Iliffe Trustee 26 February 2019
None on record
John William Lucas Trustee 25 October 2016
None on record
ELAINE MARGARET YARWOOD Trustee 26 July 2016
None on record
LYNN IRENE CHETWYND Trustee
None on record
CAROLYN JEAN NEWMAN Trustee
None on record