Accounts and annual returns THE EMPOWERMENT GROUP

Charity number: 1190584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 05 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 21 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window