Accounts and annual returns DEMETER

Charity number: 1191266
Charity reporting is up to date (96 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 May 2025 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 May 2025 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 May 2025 462 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 May 2025 462 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 May 2025 827 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 May 2025 827 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 March 2022 52 days late Download Open in new window