Accounts and annual returns INDUS EXCELLENCE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1192977
Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 11 September 2024 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
Annual return 30 August 2022 13 July 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days
Annual return 30 August 2021 13 July 2023 378 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days