HOLDING SPACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support to parents, chlidren and families.A safe space where you can connect talk,share and be supported along your journey.A non judgemental place where you know its okay not to be okay.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Norris | Chair | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Rosson-Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Hale | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Grant Tythan Sanders | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Message FCA | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.96k | £114.95k | £76.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.67k | £72.39k | £90.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN EASTBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND PROVISION FOR THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Hyde Gardens
Eastbourne
East Sussex
BN21 4PN
- Phone:
- 01323 315005
- Email:
- hansa@holdingspace.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window