ZIMBABWE NEWPORT VOLUNTEERING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides youth work provision in Newport, Wales and Mufakose, Zimbabwe which is supported by a Welsh government scheme through Hub Cymru Africa. We use the vehicle of sports and arts to empower young people and their communities. To provide opportunities for young people to be purposely active in pursuing the wellbeing benefits, career potential while promoting community cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 21 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT MUZA | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Sheehy | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samson Muputa | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ezala Beni | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kukanya Mpofu | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £8.48k | £24.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00k | £5.48k | £24.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NEWPORT, WALES, UNITED KINGDOM AND MUFAKOSE, HARARE, ZIMBABWE (A) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD BANKS AND (B) PROMOTION OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING BOOKS AND (C) PAYMENTS OF SCHOOL FEES INTENDED TO BRING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES TO A REASONABLE STANDARD. (2) TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NEWPORT, WALES, UNITED KINGDOM AND MUFAKOSE, HARARE, ZIMBABWE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 72
Greenwood
Beaufort Road
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP19 7NR
- Phone:
- 07871277103
- Email:
- zimnewport@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window