Financial history RENNINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 516439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £20.28k £20.81k £21.95k £35.83k £18.47k
Total expenditure £15.97k £7.53k £23.21k £33.27k £27.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.30k £3.72k £2.75k N/A