WIRRAL WOMEN'S AND CHILDREN'S AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wirral
Governance
- 03 May 1985: Standard registration
- 11 January 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 January 2006: Funds transferred to 1106399 WIRRAL WOMEN & CHILDRENS' AID
- WOMEN'S REFUGE (Working name)
- WOMENS REFUGE (WIRRAL) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £336.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £321.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 21 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 16 September 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 11 March 2005 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 11 March 2005 | 39 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 16 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 22 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED VIOLENCE OR MALTREATMENT IN THEIR HOMES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window