The Aortic Dissection Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aortic Dissection Charitable Trust Our mission is to save lives by improving the diagnosis of aortic dissection and bringing consistency of treatment across the patient pathways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 2020: Standard registration
- THINK AORTA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Fowler | Chair | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kyriakides | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Cooper | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Latham OBE, MP | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.69k | £55.72k | £82.32k | £120.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £10.49k | £26.01k | £55.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 SEP 2020 as amended on 27 Nov 2020 as amended on 29 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR AT RISK OF AORTIC DISSECTION BY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, EDUCATION AND CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS TO INFLUENCE POLICY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘AORTIC DISSECTION’ IS DEFINED AS THOSE CONDITIONS DESCRIBED IN SECTION BD 50 OF THE INTERNATIONAL CLASSIFICATION OF DISEASES VERSION 11.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TADCT
PO Box Number: 812
Hope Valley
Chesterfield
S40 9QY
- Phone:
- 07714105929
- Email:
- hello@tadct.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window