Accounts and annual returns LONDON BEL CANTO FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1191941
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2022 13 February 2023 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 13 February 2023 412 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required